PRISONERS' ADVICE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRISONERS' ADVICE SERVICE PROVIDES LEGAL ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO PRISONERS IN ENGLAND AND WALES REGARDING THEIR RIGHTS, PARTICULARLY THE APPLICATION OF THE PRISON RULES AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF IMPRISONMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1996: Standard registration
- PRISONERS ADVICE SERVICE PAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominique Webb | Chair | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Chanel Coll | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Barba | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joy Helen Lewis | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Dodd | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Le-Billon | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Kassim Gaffar | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|||||
MARTINE LIGNON | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £541.04k | £549.84k | £488.88k | £567.07k | £498.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £476.88k | £487.96k | £433.76k | £485.33k | £488.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £53.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £371.54k | £345.30k | N/A | £82.61k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £169.29k | £204.29k | N/A | £150.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £206 | £248 | N/A | £6.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £328.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £10.00k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £389.86k | £460.20k | N/A | £449.64k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £87.01k | £27.76k | N/A | £35.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.85k | £14.15k | N/A | £15.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE AND REHABILITATE PERSONS HELD IN PENAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG THE AFORESAID PERSONS AND THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF A FREE SERVICE OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE LEGAL PROFESSION, IN RELATION TO THE LAW RELATING TO THE RIGHTS OF PRISONERS (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL MEAN PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR THROUGH ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER) AND MENTALLY DISORDERED PATIENTS WITHIN THE SCOPE OF PART III OF THE MENTAL HEALTH ACT 1983 AND THE RIGHTS OF THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS. (4) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE IN A CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRISONERS ADVICE SERVICE
PO BOX 46199
LONDON
EC1M 4XA
- Phone:
- 02072533323
- Email:
- admin@prisonersadvice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window