Financial history TRINITY THEATRE AND ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1054547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.45m £674.49k £1.24m £1.37m £1.26m
Total expenditure £1.33m £670.13k £1.05m £1.62m £1.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £171.21k N/A
Income from government grants £277.13k £267.63k £394.85k £86.77k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £92.00k £420.59k £712.98k £285.68k £189.18k
Income - Other trading activities £300.94k £124.14k £173.82k £244.56k £283.41k
Income - Charitable activities £777.30k £92.19k £334.82k £782.74k £714.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.13k £229 £39 £319 £1.63k
Income - Other £0 £37.34k £21.34k £60.35k £75.97k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £532.46k £898.05k £1.39m £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £224.75k £137.68k £152.35k £222.56k £215.81k
Expenditure - Governance £9.15k £6.64k £13.08k £16.81k £13.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0