HORSHAM UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public and in particular the education of middle aged and older people who are not in full-time gainful employment and who reside in the area administered by Horsham D.C. The provision of facilities for leisure time and recreational activities with the object of improving the conditions of life for the above persons in the interests of their social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 April 1996: Standard registration
- HORSHAM U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Charles Hill | Chair | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Broomer | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Bennett | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Brockett | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pam Johnson | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Valentine | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Harrod | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jenny Faulkner | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ESME D CLOHERTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.84k | £17.44k | £16.33k | £34.40k | £38.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.38k | £23.22k | £16.85k | £35.62k | £40.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1998, 16TH MAY 2000, 28 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2018 as amended on 10 Nov 2020 as amended on 31 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HORSHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Aphrodite Way
BURGESS HILL
West Sussex
RH15 0XQ
- Phone:
- 01444222169
- Email:
- treasurer@horshamu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window