Accounts and annual returns OPEN COLLEGE OF SIGN LANGUAGE

Charity Number: 1055022
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 11 April 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 11 April 2025 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 June 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required