Financial history BIRMINGHAM TRUST FOR PSYCHOANALYTIC PSYCHOTHERAPY

Charity Number: 1055137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £522.67k £833.57k £806.05k £782.85k £863.49k
Total expenditure £523.50k £551.41k £673.46k £771.77k £969.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £625.74k £659.72k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £69.50k £60.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £152.69k £41.29k £4.87k £29.08k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £679.92k £764.06k £774.40k £827.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £961 £702 £3.58k £7.41k
Income - Other £522.67k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £37.50k £0 £24.51k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £551.41k £673.46k £771.77k £969.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.48k £3.40k £4.01k £4.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £523.50k £0 £0 £0 £0