Financial history MISSIO

Charity Number: 1056651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.01m £5.07m £5.10m £4.06m £5.63m
Total expenditure £5.08m £3.20m £4.94m £4.92m £4.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.88m £5.02m £5.06m £3.87m £5.40m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £30.80k £0
Income - Charitable activities £38.85k £11.50k £16.57k £0 £45.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.24k £4.85k £22.37k £105.85k £121.84k
Income - Other £79.43k £33.80k £8.39k £51.06k £65.98k
Income - Legacies £858.76k £1.74m £1.92m £829.11k £1.76m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.77m £2.93m £4.64m £4.56m £4.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £312.40k £274.75k £309.46k £353.45k £353.49k
Expenditure - Governance £21.28k £14.82k £17.66k £28.98k £23.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0