DEVON PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST SPECIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees shall hold the trust fund upon trust to apply the income, and at their discretion, so far as may be permissible, the capital, for any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- Open Up (Working name)
- DEVON PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITABLE FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- EAST DEVON PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITABLE FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEVON PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.00k | £378.00k | £748.00k | £89.00k | £116.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.00k | £173.00k | £159.00k | £139.00k | £207.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £694.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £40.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £14.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £682.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £105.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £54.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE TRUST DEED OF LINKED CHARITY SUFFIX 04
Charitable objects
SEE CONSTITUENT 04
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- DEVON PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST SPECIAL CHARITY
- DEVON PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITABLE FUND
- EAST DEVON PRIMARY CARE TRUST SPECIAL CHARITY
- EXETER AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICE GENERAL CHARITY
- EXETER PRIMARY CARE TRUST SPECIAL CHARITY
- HONITON HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- MID DEVON PRIMARY CARE TRUST SPECIAL CHARITY
- 22 June 2004 : Standard registration
- 29 July 2013 : Asset transfer in
- 29 July 2013 : Asset transfer in
- 29 July 2013 : Asset transfer in
- 29 July 2013 : Asset transfer in
- 29 July 2013 : Asset transfer in
Contact information
- Address:
-
WONFORD HOUSE HOSPITAL
DRYDEN ROAD
EXETER
EX2 5AF
- Phone:
- 01392 663917
- Email:
- dpt.charity@nhs.net
- Website:
-
JUSTGIVING.COM/DEVONPARTNERSHIP
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window