CHRIST'S CHAPEL OF GOD'S GIFT AT DULWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of Christ's Chapel of God's Gift at Dulwich as a place of worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southwark
Governance
- 04 November 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Irene Bishop CBE | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Menna Lyn McGregor | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Angel Faith Locken | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Peter Cornforth | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Patrick Mark Seth | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Rachel Gough | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Howard Robert Kerr BA, MBA | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Damilola Ayodele Ayeko | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Stephen John Parry | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
Helen Mary Freeman | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rosemarie Bernadette Jones MRICS | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Fiona Price LLB ACA | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Thelma Penny Rose King LLB | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Ben Simon Kottler BA Law,CFA | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.57k | £63.58k | £90.11k | £147.04k | £105.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.76k | £114.68k | £82.11k | £109.84k | £112.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS SEALED ON 31 JULY 1995
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE (A) TO MAINTAIN THE CHAPEL KNOWN AS CHRIST'S CHAPEL ("THE CHAPEL") AT DULWICH AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR THE USE OFRESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE DULWICH ALMSHOUSE CHARITY, AND OF PUPILS AND STAFF OF THE SCHOOLS OF THE CHARITIES RESPECTIVELY CALLED DULWICH COLLEGE, ALLEYN'S SCHOOL AND JAMES ALLEN'S GIRLS SCHOOL, AND FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RITES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, AND (B) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK ASSOCIATED WITH THE CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
DULWICH
Linked charities
- 04 November 1996 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DULWICH ESTATE
THE OLD COLLEGE
18 GALLERY ROAD
LONDON
SE21 7AE
- Phone:
- 02082991000
- Email:
- info@thedulwichestate.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window