Financial history The Moriah Legacy Trust

Charity number: 1058013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/08/2020 29/08/2021 29/08/2022 29/08/2023 29/08/2024
Total gross income £68.03k £2.36k £240 £32.14k £111.56k
Total expenditure £115.13k £3.53k £14.70k £47.13k £97.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A