Financial history YESBE LIMITED

Charity number: 1058128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £188.33k £188.65k £1.46m £1.48m £201.42k
Total expenditure £188.46k £186.97k £1.19m £1.52m £527.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £4.50k £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.45m £1.48m N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £413.36k £437.32k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £776.18k £1.08m N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £26.64k £28.40k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £386.72k £408.93k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £776.18k £1.08m N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A