Financial history FRIENDS OF HIGHGATE CEMETERY TRUST

Charity number: 1058392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.30m £1.64m £1.73m £2.05m £3.11m
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.37m £1.75m £2.27m £2.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £52.31k £76.40k £76.46k £158.52k £279.03k
Income - Other trading activities £718.64k £17.96k £45.55k £39.09k £33.27k
Income - Charitable activities £332.15k £1.37m £1.42m £1.58m £1.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £178.45k £166.46k £185.26k £257.13k £268.51k
Income - Other £22.54k £8.50k £1.85k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £25.50k £38.00k £24.65k £95.07k £170.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £619.63k £1.31m £1.67m £2.18m £2.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £424.41k £61.64k £76.56k £82.17k £88.87k
Expenditure - Governance £10.71k £40.57k £92.97k £9.65k £1.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £89