Financial history AS-SIRAAT FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1059461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £39.47k £11.76k £1.18k £10.06k £34.70k
Total expenditure £22.07k £6.90k £12.92k £13.83k £21.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A