SEAHOUSES HOSTEL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of residential youth centre, courses, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of educating and assisting.Provision of conference rooms and suitable accomodation for use in connection with such residential youth centre. For the purpose of a community venue for the use of inhabitants of North Sunderland and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 02 December 1996: Standard registration
- 25 October 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1177064 SEAHOUSES HOSTEL
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.34k | £49.27k | £48.85k | £55.63k | £65.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.12k | £38.61k | £46.68k | £51.87k | £59.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 27 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 27 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 29 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 29 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 01 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 01 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 15 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 15 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 MAY 1989 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. FOR FULL OBJECT DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF THE DEED DATED 12 MAY 1989
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NORTHERN ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window