THE WALTER HAZELL CHARITABLE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards of annual student grants for further education. Awards of Christmas payments to ex employee pensioners of BPC Hazells.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 23 December 1996: Standard registration
- 18 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1177138 WINDSOR & MAIDENHEAD YOUTH AND COMMUNITY COUNSELLI...
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1142732 PROGRESSABILITY.ORG
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1147814 BUCKSVISION
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1165882 AYLESBURY YOUTH ACTION
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1103063 Buckinghamshire and East Berkshire Mind
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1070267 COMMUNITY IMPACT BUCKS
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1073861 BUCKINGHAMSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.84k | £10.98k | £11.14k | £11.66k | £9.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.61k | £29.79k | £33.21k | £30.14k | £26.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 11 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/09/2013
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ANY BENEFICIARY AAS THEY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT; (11) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR SICKNESS OF ANY BENEFICIARY AS THEY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window