SNAP (SPECIAL NEEDS ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SNAP provides indoor and outdoor play facilities for children with special needs and disabilities. We cater for children of all ages and disabilities from the most challenging to those with profound and multiple mental & physical disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 06 January 1997: Standard registration
- 25 July 2019: Funds received from 1143927 ALLSTARS PLAYGROUP
- SNAP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT HEIGHWAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Winton Levett | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kim Punter | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Spoors | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marie OBoyle-Duggan | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tim Gimbert | Trustee | 05 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.77k | £29.20k | £28.20k | £66.85k | £49.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.86k | £52.80k | £46.40k | £70.45k | £61.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 October 2022 | 426 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 October 2022 | 426 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF AN ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
S N A P
Pye Green Road
CANNOCK
WS11 5RW
- Phone:
- 01543579286
- Email:
- snapcannock@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window