Financial history LEAMINGTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1060574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £67.36k £68.39k £47.79k £66.14k £67.90k
Total expenditure £58.70k £48.06k £51.44k £64.68k £67.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.05k N/A N/A N/A