ANGLICAN CHURCH PLANTING INITIATIVES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACPI exists to serve tomorrow's churches today by encouraging and assisting the planting of healthy, missionary-minded churches. We are a small charity, but with a committed central team and a large national network, working with churches and people called to church planting, fresh expressions of church and multiplying communities of mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Denmark
- Finland
- Germany
- Italy
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 13 February 1997: Standard registration
- 28 July 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 28 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1201506 THE GREGORY CENTRE FOR CHURCH MULTIPLICATION
- A C P I (Working name)
- Paying staff
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.73k | £13.28k | £11.05k | £14.06k | £9.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.38k | £13.44k | £11.55k | £13.06k | £9.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 December 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING TEACHING TRAINING AND EQUIPPING FOR WORK IN CHRISTIAN MISSION MINISTRY AND CHURCH PLANTING AND BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT C)TO PROMOTE AND FULFILL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREAS IN WHICH THE TRUST MAY BE OPERATING FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window