THE FRIENDS OF POPPLETON TITHE BARN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserve ancient building. Act as a centre (bookable) for local activities such as art exhibitions, christmas fairs and other charity events. Venue for meetings, voting, weddings, funerals and other events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Kay | Chair | 07 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Carol Challis | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas John Frank Craven | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE NEWMAN | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET COLES | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GRENVILLE PEARSON | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA RITCHIE | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN VINCENT GAUNT | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MACKAY | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARA HOLLIDAY | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
RON PEARSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD ANTHONY CANTRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
QUENTIN JOHN ANGUS MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JAMES MACKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.09k | £14.42k | £10.67k | £17.07k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.74k | £7.39k | £46.40k | £10.72k | £11.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 1996 as amended on 21 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE TITHE BARN (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE (3) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES (4) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NETHER POPPLETON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 MILLFIELD LANE
NETHER POPPLETON
YORK
YO26 6NF
- Phone:
- 01904785906
- Email:
- randsholliday@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window