Financial history BRIGHTON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1060832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £43.85k £25.70k £20.88k £24.04k £24.79k
Total expenditure £70.74k £32.34k £20.53k £24.10k £20.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A