Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HEADINGLEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1060959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.79k £13.42k £8.27k £8.01k £4.63k
Total expenditure £6.52k £13.79k £7.73k £9.10k £4.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A