Register of Charities - The Charity Commission LAKE MALAWI LAY TRAINING FUND
Charity number: 234518-186
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTERS DATED 30/08/1977, 15/09/1977 AND 27/10/1977
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
THE TRAINING OF LAY MEN AND WOMEN FOR RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE WORK IN THE DIOCESE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
- 27 November 1967: Standard registration
- 01 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.