THE ROTARY CLUB OF FARNHAM BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports local and international charitable objectives. This includes: support to international disasters and emergencies, eg. tsunamis, earthquakes: general humanitarian support, eg. distribution of medical equipment in the third world; support to local hospices, hospitals and disabled institutions and support to needy individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- Burma
- India
- Malawi
- Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 12 September 1961: Standard registration
- 09 January 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 January 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Paul Whitlock BEng MBA | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Michael John Nicholls ACIB BSc | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
BRIAN THOMAS | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Roger John Jude | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ian Charles Sargeant | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM ATKINSON CMG MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.22k | £15.28k | £33.34k | £17.77k | £25.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.74k | £12.74k | £34.57k | £18.02k | £18.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JULY 1961
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS FINANCIALLY DISTRESSED AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES ANDOBJECTS AS THE CLUB SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SPINNEY
FARNHAM ROAD
EWSHOT
FARNHAM
GU10 5AU
- Phone:
- 07796177949
- Email:
- iansargeant@brocas.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window