LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HASLEMERE AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL

Charity number: 200656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To foster & encourage the public interest in the patients & the support of the work of the Hospital by means of voluntary service (& to assist in the recruitment of voluntary workers.) To provide funds for the resources of the Hospital service, either by supplementation or by putting such funds at the disposal of the Hospital Committee. To provide a link between the Hospital & the Community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £36,810
Total expenditure: £27,406

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 April 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSEMARY PARRY Chair 07 June 2010
CONFORD VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Douglas Paul Streatfield Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Dr Janet French Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Penny Bradley Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
LINDA DONALDSON Trustee 19 September 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HASLEMERE
Received: On time
Dr Mark Hurst Trustee 16 November 2015
THE HUNTER CENTRE
Received: On time
BOB MONTEATH Trustee 30 May 2012
THE 1959 GROUP OF CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN STUART ORR Trustee 30 May 2012
THE HASLEMERE PENNY HA'PENNY TRUST
Received: On time
MARTIN COAKLEY Trustee 07 June 2010
THE COMMONWEALTH RESOUNDS
Received: On time
HAMMER BOTTOM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HUNTER CENTRE
Received: On time
Janet Steward Trustee 18 May 1992
None on record
ANTHEA VALENTYN BROCK Trustee
None on record
MRS CARLIE JACKSON Trustee
None on record
MRS JOSSIE MCCARTHY Trustee
None on record
ARTHUR SYDNEY BEECHER Trustee
None on record
ROBERT ARTHUR KNOWLES Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE MICHELLE WARRINGTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.54k £18.05k £9.67k £11.93k £36.81k
Total expenditure £16.67k £2.86k £7.13k £62.20k £27.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Haslemere Hospital
CHURCH LANE
HASLEMERE
SURREY
GU27 2BJ
Phone:
01428684613