Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHGATE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 200736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.54k £6.15k £5.84k £5.94k £4.19k
Total expenditure £13.92k £6.50k £4.83k £5.82k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A