Financial history THE PARISH LANDS AND OTHER CHARITIES

Charity Number: 201038
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £268.46k £74.98k £83.68k £84.71k £84.71k
Total expenditure £109.34k £265.95k £133.19k £65.08k £65.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A