Financial history MRS MARY MONTAGUE'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 201829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.09k £1.10k £641 £649 £651
Total expenditure £767 £1.08k £542 £748 £635
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A