Financial history OKEHAMPTON UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 202686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £403.43k £506.98k £506.76k £502.02k £456.17k
Total expenditure £359.67k £429.60k £404.22k £499.85k £561.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £90.00k £100 £1.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £416.98k £426.47k £501.02k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £80.19k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £429.60k £404.22k £499.85k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £7.03k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £357.04k £271.57k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A