Trustees OKEHAMPTON UNITED CHARITY

Charity Number: 202686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ross Campbell Chair 25 September 2019
OKEHAMPTON FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Robert Tolley Trustee 14 May 2025
OKEHAMPTON COMMUNITY AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
OKEHAMPTON FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Richard James Clyde Colman Trustee 14 May 2025
OKEHAMPTON FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Carol Elizabeth Chapman Trustee 30 January 2025
OKEHAMPTON FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Kevin John Harding Trustee 30 January 2025
OKEHAMPTON FOUNDATION
Recently registered
DR M IRELAND Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
John Robert Simmons Trustee 22 January 2024
None on record
Christine Marie Marsh Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
Philip Davies Trustee 19 October 2021
OKEHAMPTON AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
OKEHAMPTON COMMUNITY AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
OKEHAMPTON FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Dr PHILIP JAMES MURRAY Trustee 29 September 2021
THE BRITISH GRASSLAND SOCIETY
Received: On time
Maria Cooper Trustee 13 June 2021
OKEHAMPTON FOUNDATION
Recently registered
SIMMONS HOMES
Received: On time