Trustees COLD ASHTON PARISH HALL
Charity Number: 202716

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS WYLDE | Chair | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Darren Frost | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Trapp | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Smith | Trustee | 14 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JAMES KNIGHT | Trustee | 18 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HUBERT LIPPIATT | Trustee | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET GORRINGE | Trustee | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN TRAPP | Trustee | 30 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN PETER MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.