Financial history AXBRIDGE TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 202880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £27.03k £27.43k £12.25k £27.41k £12.15k
Total expenditure £19.68k £13.37k £14.10k £9.38k £8.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.45k £22.10k N/A £5.76k £3.94k