THE BATH PRESERVATION TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage and support the conservation, evolution and enhancement of Bath and its environs within a framework appropriate to both its historic setting and its sustainable future; and to provide educational resources that focus on the architectural and historic importance of the City.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£1,547,385
Donations and legacies | £166.70k | |
Charitable activities | £1.14m | |
Other trading activities | £152.25k | |
Investments | £89.28k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,271,001
Raising funds | £126.70k | |
Charitable activities | £3.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£29,009 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £32,494 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £126.70k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.14m |
People

32 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
109 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 07 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eve Coulter Salomon CBE | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Nicholas Tredwin | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Arthurs | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey John Rich | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shawn Ezri Naphtali Sobers | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julian Gooding | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Speed-Grenfell | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Annabel Sarah Thomas MacGregor | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Alexander John Creed | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Victoria Jane Diane Thornton | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peta Compton Hall | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £1.24m | £1.91m | £4.70m | £1.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07m | £874.96k | £1.62m | £1.38m | £3.27m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £593.94k | £1.17m | £242.20k | £32.49k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £137.66k | £970.87k | £1.45m | £3.86m | £166.70k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £126.66k | £21.21k | £45.48k | £122.73k | £152.25k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £736.20k | £153.31k | £316.19k | £618.11k | £1.14m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £88.61k | £91.64k | £95.23k | £96.08k | £89.28k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £120 | £0 | £17.50k | £205.13k | £92.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £978.95k | £838.49k | £1.57m | £1.29m | £3.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £94.24k | £36.47k | £52.46k | £91.06k | £126.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.28k | £7.91k | £15.27k | £13.42k | £14.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £30.71k | £19.33k | £21.93k | £49.23k | £23.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.32m | £1.38m | £1.36m | £1.64m | £1.71m | |
|
Long-term investments | £766.79k | £774.02k | £827.22k | £802.25k | £831.26k | |
|
Other assets | £655.92k | £1.03m | £1.40m | £4.41m | £2.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £86.61k | £153.43k | £221.98k | £191.20k | £447.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 1934 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 AUGUST 1975, 24 NOVEMBER 2005, 20 NOVEMBER 2008, 15 OCTOBER 2009. as amended on 23 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE AND TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CHARACTER, AMENITIES AND BUILDINGS OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF BATH (B) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC RIGHTS OF WAY AND THE BEAUTY OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AROUND THE CITY OF BATH (AND TO PROMOTE ITS FULLEST ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC) (C) TO PROVIDE AND/OR PARTICIPATE IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF MUSEUMS, LIBRARIES, GALLERIES AND OTHER FACILITIES TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE AND OTHER SUBJECTS OF PUBLIC INTEREST IN CONNECTION WITH THE CITY OF BATH AND FOR THE PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BATH AND EVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ROYAL CRESCENT
BATH
BA1 2LR
- Phone:
- 01225338727
- Email:
- admin@bptrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window