ALDERSHOT CHARITIES FUND

Charity number: 206247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of Poverty through grants to individuals and organisations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £28,762
Total expenditure: £38,035

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 May 1962: Standard registration
  • 26 January 2009: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 26 January 2009: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HAMICH SOPHIA NEWCOMBE CHARITY (Working name)
  • ISABELLI SCHROEDER CHARITY (Working name)
  • THOMAS SMITH CHARITY (Working name)
  • HARRIET SOPHIA NEWCOME (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR TONY HORTON Chair
None on record
Anne Christine Varney Trustee 05 February 2021
None on record
MICHAEL ANTHONY PAUL CLIST Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Barbara Margaret Fletcher Trustee 21 February 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALDERSHOT SAINT MICHAEL
Received: On time
VALERIE RENTON Trustee
None on record
RICHARD DAVID FAWN Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS FLEET
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.20k £15.24k £15.64k £17.14k £28.76k
Total expenditure £7.95k £24.36k £39.73k £33.65k £38.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 19 NOVEMBER 1968.
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING PERSONS IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF ALDERSHOT.
Registration history
  • 02 May 1962 : Standard registration
  • 26 January 2009 : Removed
  • 26 January 2009 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
25 Burnside
Fleet
GU51 3RE
Phone:
01252657257
Website:

No information available