CHARITY OF MARY BAKER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in the London Borough of Tower Hamlets to make grants to individuals and organisations for the relief of poverty, sickness, distress or hardship and gives priority to those living in the parish of Christ Church Spitalfields
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Darren John Wolf | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Natasha Pearle Grimmett | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ailish Elizabeth Winch | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Daniel Vaughan | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
FAY CATTINI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK JOHN STRIDE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.47k | £8.69k | £8.77k | £8.41k | £8.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.91k | £6.96k | £7.08k | £11.83k | £7.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 29TH AUGUST 1973
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSON RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF CHRISTCHURCH SPITALFIELDS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CHRIST-CHURCH SPITALFIELDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 MONTHOPE ROAD
LONDON
E1 5LS
- Phone:
- 02073771086
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window