ST MARY'S MISSION HALL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Upper Holloway. The trustees do this by considering applications for grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Islington
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Macfarlane | Chair | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Sweet | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
REV TAMSIN MERCHANT | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ANNE LAWTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARGARET SMYTH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £4.50k | £4.50k | £4.52k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.71k | £645 | £6.52k | £953 | £10.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2024 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 5TH MARCH 1954 AND 21ST MARCH 1962 AND 30 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORNSEY RISE WHITEHALL PARK
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY HORNSEY RISE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HIGHCROFT ROAD
LONDON
N19 3AQ
- Phone:
- 02072811459
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window