REYDON TRUST

Charity Number: 206873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help needy in the local community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £45,811
Total expenditure: £43,030

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 15 July 2024: Funds received from 207260 REYDON ESTATE CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE POOR'S ALLOTMENT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Rebecca Clark Trustee 28 November 2023
SOUTHWOLD FILM SOCIETY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF SOUTHWOLD LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWOLD TRUST
Received: On time
Nicholas David Humphry Trustee 24 March 2021
None on record
Sally Hunting Trustee 05 June 2018
None on record
Benjamin Cooper Trustee 05 June 2018
None on record
David Christopher Smith Trustee 06 February 2014
None on record
Cameron Ross Walker McClue Trustee 28 November 2013
None on record
MICHAEL MAYHEW Trustee 08 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £59.12k £41.17k £30.26k £37.85k £45.81k
Total expenditure £42.06k £20.62k £22.09k £51.66k £43.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 September 2024 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 September 2024 218 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 September 2024 583 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Reydon Trust
Reydon Village Hall Lowestoft Road
Reydon
SOUTHWOLD
Suffolk
IP18 6RF
Phone:
07754096008
Website:

No information available