KING EDWARD'S HOSPITAL FUND FOR LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The King's Fund is a charity that seeks to understand how the health system in England can be improved. Using that insight, we help to shape policy, transform services & bring about behaviour change. Our work includes research, analysis, leadership development and service improvement. We also offer a wide range of resources to help everyone working in health to share knowledge, learning and ideas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 January 1963: Standard registration
- 21 September 1995: Removed
- KING'S FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.33m | £12.76m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.39m | £15.55m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.48k | £5.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.75m | £1.50m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.14m | £7.69m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.24m | £3.38m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £188.00k | £187.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.64k | £1.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.30m | £13.76m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £68.42k | £98.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.55m | £1.17m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £620.00k | £344.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 13 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 28 February 2012 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 25 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
KING EDWARD'S HOSPITAL FUND FOR LONDON ACT 1907 AND SCHEMES OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF 10 JULY 1992 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT, BENEFIT OR EXTENSION OF ALL THE HOSPITALS OF LONDON OR SOME OR ANY OF THEM AND SUCH OTHER TO SERVE THAT OBJECTIVE
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN POLICE DISTRICT AND CITY OF LONDON.
Linked charities
- 10 January 1963 : Standard registration
- 21 September 1995 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window