BEDWORTH RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 208020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the charity is to assist people in the old urban district of Bedworth. It is not able to make grants for assistance that falls within the responsibility of public bodies, although it may supplement services in certain cases. Grants are made of up to -ú200 to individuals in need. It makes donations to individuals, charities and worthy causes in the area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £3,353
Total expenditure: £3,881

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 1962: Standard registration
  • 14 June 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE BEDWORTH SICK AND NEEDY FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathleen Farmer Trustee 01 July 2024
NICHOLAS CHAMBERLAINE'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NICHOLAS CHAMBERLAINE'S HOSPITAL AND SERMON
Received: On time
Rev Ann Poultney Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Karen Davison Trustee 16 January 2021
None on record
Rev David Poultney Trustee 10 December 2018
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CAMP HILL
Recently registered
NICHOLAS CHAMBERLAINE'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, BEDWORTH
Received: On time
NICHOLAS CHAMBERLAINE'S HOSPITAL AND SERMON
Received: On time
Rev Mark Turner Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Janet Lucas Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Lynda Greasley Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Fr Michael Gamble Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Paul Spencer Trustee 10 June 2014
NICHOLAS CHAMBERLAINE'S HOSPITAL AND SERMON
Received: On time
JANET CORRIGAN Trustee 11 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.88k £3.32k £8.20k £6.42k £3.35k
Total expenditure £5.12k £5.64k £3.42k £5.51k £3.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 June 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 29TH MARCH 1955.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF BEDWORTH AS CONSTITUTED ON 29TH MARCH 1955
Registration history
  • 30 November 1962 : Standard registration
  • 14 June 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
POETS CORNER CENTRE
20 DRAYTON ROAD
BEDWORTH
CV12 9EY
Phone:
07786 697472
Website:

No information available