THE ST MARY'S HOSPITAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 208512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Housing for needy - provided for 10 persons of either sex - normally of pensionable age who do not have the financial resources to purchase their own home.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £50,722
Total expenditure: £27,923

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HORSHAM (Working name)
  • ST MARYS HOUSE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Mary Hatton Trustee 10 May 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORSHAM DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER
Received: On time
Peter John Fruin Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Rev Lisa Helen Barnett Trustee 23 November 2020
None on record
Morag Davies Trustee 25 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORSHAM DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER
Received: On time
STEPHEN ARDEN BENSON Trustee 30 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.83k £41.20k £43.95k £44.49k £50.72k
Total expenditure £45.84k £54.97k £43.16k £40.07k £27.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 26 JUNE 1953, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. FOR EXTRAORDINARY REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT & REBUILDING OF ALMSHOUSE BUILDINGS. 2. ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS (NOT UNDER 55 YEARS OF AGE) OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO BELONG TO THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND ARE RESIDENT (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES) IN THE PARISH FOR OVER FOUR YEARS. (FOR MEANS OF APPLICATION SEE SCHEME OF 26TH JUNE 1953) (ALSO SEE CLAUSE 17 OF SCHEME FOR SPECIAL PROVISIONS RELATING TO STANFORD CHARITY) (BEQUEST OR RESIDUARY ESTATE AND LEGACY OF ú1,000).
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF HORSHAM.
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
HOSPITAL CHARITIES-ST MARY
THE PARISH OFFICE
THE CHURCH CENTRE
CAUSEWAY
HORSHAM
RH12 1HE
Phone:
01403253762
Website:

No information available