Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WELLS CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 208797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £72.17k £277.98k £389.34k £158.38k £546.66k
Total expenditure £48.88k £14.23k £35.61k £48.16k £48.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £148.25k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.90k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.26k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £101.70k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £41.19k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.04k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0