KING EDWARD VII'S HOSPITAL (SISTER AGNES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity are:- To operate an acute hospital. To provide the highest standards of patient care. To provide treatment at preferential rates to service patients serving or retired and their spouses. The aim of the council is to operate a hospital that is open to any member of the public and which will provide quality of care and cleanliness that contribute to their early recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£47,360,000
Donations and legacies | £5.81m | |
Charitable activities | £39.81m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £115.00k | |
Other | £1.62m |
Total expenditure:
£53,221,000
Raising funds | £828.00k | |
Charitable activities | £52.39m | |
Other | £0 |
£19,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £828.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £52.39m |
People

355 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 23 |
£70k to £80k | 9 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- SISTER AGNES (Working name)
- KING EDWARD VII'S HOSPITAL FOR OFFICERS, SISTER AGNES FOUNDER (Previous name)
- KING EDWARD VII'S HOSPITAL SISTER AGNES (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Richard Brook Sykes | Chair | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Madelaine McTernan | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Alison Hofman | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Aline Carlotto Silveira Miller | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sanjay Shah | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Fiona Elizabeth Lawrence Driscoll | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Biddle | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Sinclair Kirby | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIR STUART ANTHONY LIPTON | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.71m | £31.30m | £40.36m | £44.08m | £47.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.21m | £33.52m | £44.20m | £52.83m | £53.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £438.00k | £7.75m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.49m | £739.00k | £5.11m | £5.02m | £5.81m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £28.91m | £29.90m | £34.94m | £38.63m | £39.81m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £590.00k | £407.00k | £309.00k | £246.00k | £115.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £724.00k | £249.00k | £4.00k | £181.00k | £1.62m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £827.00k | £90.00k | £180.00k | £1.13m | £273.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £32.72m | £33.23m | £43.83m | £52.06m | £52.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £489.00k | £284.00k | £371.00k | £772.00k | £828.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £259.00k | £271.08k | £531.00k | £653.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £154.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £19.24m | £25.02m | £34.27m | £34.54m | £33.70m | |
|
Long-term investments | £20.85m | £20.02m | £10.31m | £6.02m | £4.45m | |
|
Other assets | £19.34m | £17.95m | £16.47m | £12.59m | £15.41m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£697.00k | -£799.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.32m | £5.55m | £7.25m | £9.00m | £15.30m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 21/08/1930,SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER 20/02/1951.BYE-LAWS BY ORDERS OF PRIVY COUNCIL 25/07/1955,11/04/1960.ROYAL CHARTER 21/11/1973,SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER 13/10/1980 & 24/6/98, AMENDMENT TO CHARTER 14/6/2000, ORDER IN COUNCIL 16/12/04. AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 11 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY OF THE CORPORATION SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AND SURGICAL TREATMENT AND DIAGNOSTIC MODALITIES AT THE HOSPITAL ON SUCH TERMS AS THE COUNCIL SHALL DETERMINE TO THE FOLLOWING CLASSES OF BENEFICIARIES IN DESCENDING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (A) ALL SERVING PERSONNEL OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES (B) ALL EX-SERVICE PERSONNEL WHO HAVE SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES (WHETHER IN A REGULAR, TEMPORARY, RESERVE OR TERRITORIAL CAPACITY) OR IN THE BRITISH INDIAN ARMED FORCES (C) SPOUSES, FORMER SPOUSES, WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS (OR SUCH SIMILAR ANALOGOUS RELATIONSHIPS RECOGNISED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND & WALES) OF ANY OF THE PERSONS DESCRIBED IN CATEGORIES A. AND B. ABOVE. (D) ANY OTHER PERSON AGED 16 AND OVER. THE COUNCIL MAY PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT AT THE HOSPITAL TO THOSE BENEFICIARIES FALLING WITHIN SUB-CLAUSES (A) TO (C) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
5-10 BEAUMONT STREET
LONDON
W1G 6AA
- Phone:
- 02074864411
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window