INCORPORATED BOURNEMOUTH FREE CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Own and operate housing (45 flats in total) for people aged 50 years or over. Funding provided for various voluntary organisations in the BournemouthPoole/Dorset Area. Some are annual donations, and others are applied for each year as "one off" grants. Liaise with all the Free Churches in the Bournemouth Area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA PAIN | Chair | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew James Pain | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Joseph Priestley | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
LESLEY CAROL MARGARET FERNAND | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
DELIA CUTLER | Trustee | 16 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY JOSEPH FERNAND | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JEAN BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.67k | £189.86k | £189.86k | £188.06k | £195.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.75k | £182.37k | £182.37k | £187.49k | £178.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1901.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL LIFE OF THE CHURCHES AND ITS SOCIETIES ETC. TO CONSIDER AND DEAL WITH SPIRITUAL AND MORAL WELFARE MATTER IN THE AREA. TO FOUND, TAKE OVER, MANAGE SCHOOLS COLLEGES ETC. FOR ALL GRADES AND TYPES. TO PROVIDE BOARD, LODGING ETC. FOR STUDENTS AND AFFORD FACILITIES FOR STUDY. TO PROMOTE, INITIATE AND CARRY ON EVANGELISTIC WORK. TO PRINT, PUBLISH AND DISTRIBUTE RELIGIOUS AND INSTRUCTIVE LITERATURE. TO FORM, MAINTAIN A LIBRARY OR LIBRARIES OF LITERATURE. TO ACQUIRE BY GIFT, PURCHASE, LEASE ETC. LANDS AND BUILDINGS, REAL AND PERSONAL, MAINTAIN AND DISPOSE OF ETC.
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
4 Church Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH6 4AT
- Phone:
- 07984139909
- Email:
- ibfcc@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window