ROYAL AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY OF ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AGRICULTURE AND RURAL CHARITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£937,835
Donations and legacies | £290.70k | |
Charitable activities | £15.65k | |
Other trading activities | £614.46k | |
Investments | £17.04k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£882,597
Raising funds | £692.33k | |
Charitable activities | £190.26k | |
Other | £0 |
£9,411 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £692.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £190.26k | |
Retained for future use | £55.24k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £692.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £190.26k | |
Retained for future use | £64.65k |
People

6 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 April 1963: Standard registration
- R A S E (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HENRY TUFNELL | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr HOSEIN KHAJEH-HOSSEINY | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Robert Nicholas Foord Drewett | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Paul James Westaway | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Julie Marion Butler | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Michael Fiddes | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Mr Nick Tapp FRAgS | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.00k | £623.00k | £363.44k | £504.48k | £947.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £357.00k | £372.00k | £321.23k | £585.31k | £882.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £48.00k | N/A | £153.21k | £290.70k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £222.00k | N/A | £329.41k | £614.46k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £19.00k | N/A | £17.54k | £15.65k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | £4.32k | £17.04k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £331.00k | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £150.00k | £102.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £79.00k | N/A | £151.83k | £190.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £293.00k | N/A | £433.48k | £692.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | £5.22k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £75.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £5.10m | £5.09m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £4.64m | N/A | £144.30k | £158.70k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £2.20m | N/A | £1.81m | £2.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £591.00k | N/A | £255.81k | £738.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 12/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 08/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 17/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 19 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ART AND PRACTICE OF AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY, HORTICULTURE, KINDRED ACTIVITIES AND THE HUSBANDRY OF LIVESTOCK (INCLUDING HORSES) AND LAND AND TO PROMOTE THE APPLICATION OF IMPROVED METHODS AND PROCESSES CONNECTED THEREWITH BY DEMONSTRATION AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS. TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AND EXPERIMENTAL WORK BY MAINTAINING AND CONDUCING A LEARNED SOCIETY AND BY PUBLICATIONS, GRANTS AND OTHER MEANS. TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES AND VALUES AMONGST RURAL COMMUNITIES IN SUCH WAS AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 30 April 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
RASE Centre
Stoneleigh Park
Kenilworth
Warwickshire
CV8 2LZ
- Phone:
- 02476692470
- Email:
- emilys@rase.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window