Financial history HUGGENS'S COLLEGE

Charity number: 210336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £305.75k £264.72k £249.02k £293.76k £444.60k
Total expenditure £290.90k £262.92k £374.90k £299.36k £348.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.06k N/A N/A N/A