BROMLEY AND SHEPPARD'S COLLEGES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide housing for Church of England Clergy and their wives/widows and sometimes supporting children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
Governance
- Bromley & Sheppard's Colleges (Working name)
- Bromley and Sheppard's Colleges (Working name)
- BROMLEY AND SHEPPARD'S COLLEGES (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Leycester Collins | Chair | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
David Willink | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Allie Kerr | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Andrew Tremlett | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev JONATHAN GIBBS | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Stephen Brace Thomas | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev George Baisley | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Tina Hill | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Revd and Rt Hon Dame Sarah Mullally | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Lynda Stimson | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Tony Bentley | Trustee | 27 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER SCOTT | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
The Most Revd and Rt Hon JUSTIN PORTAL WELBY | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN THOROGOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KATHLEEN CRAIG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £405.68k | £370.46k | £374.63k | £385.89k | £408.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £407.32k | £628.12k | £569.93k | £425.85k | £399.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 24 MAY 2004 AND 26 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 AUGUST 2007. as amended on 05 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
34. SUBJECT TO SUB-CLAUSE (2) OF THIS CLAUSE, THE COLLEGIANS SHALL BE PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE: (A) WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS OF CLERKS; OR (B) RETIRED CLERKS AND THEIR SPOUSES; OR (C) A DIVORCED OR SEPARATED WIFE OR HUSBAND OF A CLERK OR A RETIRED CLERK; OR (D) AN UNMARRIED CHILD OR STEP-CHILD OF A DECEASED COLLEGIAN, (2) WITH A PREFERENCE FOR APPLICANTS WHERE THE CLERK OR RETIRED CLERK AT SOME TIME HELD OFFICE WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT PREFERENCE GIVEN TO THE DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER.
Linked charities
- 23 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 16 October 2006 : Removed
- 16 October 2006 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHAPLAIN'S HOUSE
BROMLEY & SHEPPARDS COLLEGES
LONDON ROAD
BROMLEY
KENT
BR1 1PE
- Phone:
- 02084604712
- Email:
- admin@bandscolleges.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window