ADA COLE MEMORIAL STABLES

Charity number: 210395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's activities are channelled through Redwings Horse Sanctuary, registered charity 1068911, as is all income and expenditure

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ADA COLE RESCUE STABLES (Working name)
  • REDWINGS ADA COLE (Working name)
  • THE ADA COLE MEMORIAL STABLES LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK LITTLE Chair 14 October 2020
REDWINGS HORSE SANCTUARY
Received: On time
Paul Fileman Trustee 28 August 2024
REDWINGS HORSE SANCTUARY
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Redwings Horse Sanctuary
Hapton
Norwich
NR15 1SP
Phone:
01508481001
Website:

No information available