Financial history THE JOSEPH AND ANN SLATER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 210410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/07/2020 02/07/2021 02/07/2022 02/07/2023 02/07/2024
Total gross income £17.50k £13.80k £12.80k £15.87k £13.69k
Total expenditure £22.74k £18.14k £17.73k £19.11k £19.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A