THE ROYAL UNITED SERVICES INSTITUTE FOR DEFENCE AND SECURITY STUDIES

Charity number: 210639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RUSI is the UK's leading independent think tank on international defence and security. Its mission is to be an analytical research-led global forum for informing, influencing and enhancing public debate on a safer and more stable world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster
  • Belgium
  • Kenya
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 1962: Standard registration
  • 09 April 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • R U S I (Working name)
  • THE ROYAL UNITED SERVICES INSTITUTE FOR DEFENCE STUDIES (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir David Lidington KCB CBE Chair 16 July 2020
None on record
Sharon Thorne Trustee 29 October 2024
None on record
General Sir Nicholas Patrick Carter Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Divyata Ashiya Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
Sir Alexander Younger KCMG Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
Rt Hon Amber Augusta Rudd Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
Rt Hon John Whitaker Straw Trustee 15 December 2020
BLACKBURN YOUTH ZONE
Received: On time
Rageh Omaar Trustee 15 December 2020
THE BRITISH COUNCIL
Received: 56 days late
Admiral Sir Philip Andrew Jones GCB DL Trustee 16 July 2020
None on record
Janice Elizabeth Hall Trustee 16 April 2020
None on record
Suzanne Elizabeth Raine Trustee 04 October 2019
LINCOLNSHIRE BOMBER COMMAND MEMORIAL
Received: On time
Lord Peter Forbes Ricketts Trustee 04 October 2019
FRANCO-BRITISH COUNCIL - BRITISH SECTION
Received: On time
Laurence Stephen Geller CBE Trustee 18 July 2019
None on record
The Duke of Wellington Charles Wellesley OBE DL Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.00m £11.13m £15.37m £16.80m £18.72m
Total expenditure £9.76m £9.39m £11.85m £15.99m £18.17m
Income from government contracts £575.02k £1.54m £2.11m £1.16m £1.57m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £179.42k £350.40k £806.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.22m £1.69m £2.96m £1.57m £2.69m
Income - Other trading activities £294.28k £0 £0 £0 £31.92k
Income - Charitable activities £11.47m £9.44m £12.40m £15.23m £15.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.83k £2.04k £472 £0 £281
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £4.17k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.24m £9.04m £11.54m £15.64m £17.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £517.72k £349.48k £308.30k £348.29k £416.95k
Expenditure - Governance £81.32k £0 £0 £111.95k £157.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £15.24m £13.52m £10.55m £11.80m £23.67m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £9.03m £15.28m £15.34m £12.55m £11.47m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £9.99m £15.21m £13.70m £15.81m £17.31m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MINUTE OF MEETING 4 MAY 1915
Charitable objects
AN INDEPENDENT ORGAISATION FOR THE STUDY OF DEFENCE AND SECURITY POLICY AND PROBLEMS RELATED TO THE THREE SERVICES AND FOR THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE ON DEFENCE MATTERS TO A WIDE AUDIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 October 1962 : Standard registration
  • 09 April 1997 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
RUSI
WHITEHALL
LONDON
SW1A 2ET
Phone:
0207 747 2600