Financial history THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND, BERKSHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 210734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.20k £15.71k £79.23k £17.24k £15.12k
Total expenditure £55.15k £37.43k £44.18k £35.71k £47.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A