Financial history NUFFIELD TRUST FOR THE FORCES OF THE CROWN

Charity number: 210829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.28m £5.88m £621.54k £1.12m £1.08m
Total expenditure £2.14m £3.40m £2.17m £2.01m £2.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £87.14k £500.29k £621.54k £121.18k £1.08m
Income - Other £1.19m £5.38m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.12m £3.32m £2.14m £1.78m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.88k £0 £28.77k £234.31k £265.49k
Expenditure - Governance £68.24k £0 £33.78k £36.62k £39.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £76.44k £0 £1.74m £1.77m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £197.88k £265.49k
Expenditure - Other £0 £78.96k £0 £0 £0