TRUSTEES OF THE LONDON CLINIC LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of medical care to patients and the sick and the promotion and advancement of scientific research, good clinical practice and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£184,618,000
Donations and legacies | £6.58m | |
Charitable activities | £173.14m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £27.00k | |
Other | £4.87m |
Total expenditure:
£190,148,000
Raising funds | £4.61m | |
Charitable activities | £185.54m | |
Other | £0 |
-£16,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,844,690 from 9 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.61m | |
Charitable expenditure | £185.54m |
People

1285 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 107 |
£70k to £80k | 49 |
£80k to £90k | 27 |
£90k to £100k | 12 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 6 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 6 |
£200k to £250k | 4 |
£300k to £350k | 1 |
£400k to £450k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 19 November 1962: Standard registration
- THE LONDON CLINIC (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Adrian Bussey | Chair | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Larry Dale Richman | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Patrick Sullivan | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Howard Brett Chrisman | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Kachmer | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avinash Vazirani | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Geraldine Walters | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Paisner CBE MA LLM | Trustee | 23 May 2023 | ||||||
Philippa Anne Hardwick | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Holmes | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Gribben | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MANISH JAYANTILAL CHANDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.77m | £153.41m | £155.57m | £167.51m | £184.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.08m | £162.11m | £169.33m | £178.58m | £190.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.28m | £1.84m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £452.41k | £197.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.30m | £643.00k | £49.00k | £4.10m | £6.58m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £155.37m | £152.26m | £155.28m | £163.35m | £173.14m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £98.00k | £60.00k | £50.00k | £56.00k | £27.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £452.00k | £197.00k | £0 | £4.87m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £157.06m | £161.44m | £168.60m | £176.75m | £185.54m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £945.00k | £493.00k | £175.00k | £102.00k | £4.61m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £211.00k | £257.00k | £189.00k | £355.00k | £316.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £81.00k | £172.00k | £555.00k | £1.73m | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £200.16m | £191.67m | £190.41m | £195.55m | £191.92m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £44.41m | £39.34m | £43.20m | £51.31m | £55.61m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£13.53m | -£22.32m | -£14.54m | -£8.22m | -£3.30m | |
|
Total liabilities | £46.74m | £45.74m | £63.77m | £89.66m | £98.53m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28/11/1935, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ADOPTED 24/11/1944, 4/4/1950, 13/6/1951, 9/4/1969, 4/12/1974 5/12/1979 AND 22 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE:- (A) TO PURCHASE THE LEASEHOLD PREMISES KNOWN AS THE LONDON CLINIC AND NURSING HOME SITUATE BETWEEN HARLEY STREET AND DEVONSHIRE PLACE IN THE COUNTY OF LONDON, TOGETHER WITH THE FURNITURE, FIXTURES AND FITTINGS AND OTHER EFFECTS THEREON OR THEREIN AND THE GOODWILL OF THE BUSINESS CARRIED ON THEREON AND KNOWN AS "THE LONDON CLINIC AND NURSING HOME" AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO ENTER INTO AND CARRY INTO EFFECT, WITH OR WITHOUT MODIFICATION, AN AGREEMENT A DRAFT OF WHICH HAS ALREADY BEEN PREPARED AND IS EXPRESSED TO BE MADE BETWEEN HUMPHREYS LIMITED OF THE ONE PART AND THE TRUST OF THE OTHER PART, A COPY WHEREOF HAS, FOR THE PURPOSE OF IDENTIFICATION, BEEN SUBSCRIBED BY MESSRS. LINKLATERS & PAINES, AND TO MAINTAIN THE SAME AS AND CARRY ON THEREIN THE BUSINESS OF A CLINIC AND NURSING HOME. (B) TO CARRY ON ALL OR ANY OF THE BUSINESSES OF PROPRIETORS OR MANAGERS OF CLINICS OR NURSING HOMES, HOSPITALS OR OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS AND OTHERS BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL ATTENTION, NURSING, MASSAGE, AND ALL FORMS OF MEDICAL AND CHEMICAL METHODS AND APPLIANCES. (C) TO APPLY THE MONIES OF THE TRUST AND GENERALLY LO SUBSCRIBE OR GUARANTEE MONEY FOR ANY CHARITABLE OBJECT OR PURPOSE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT DEROGATING FROM THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING OR EXTENDING THE SCOPE THEREOF TO OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT IN LAW CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES) THE ERECTION, BUILDING, EQUIPPING, INSTALLING, REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING OF OPERATING THEATRES, HOSPITALS, NURSING HOMES, CONVALESCENT HOMES AND MEDICAL LABORATORIES, THE PROMOTION OF THE MEDICAL AND ALLIED SCIENCES AND MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH WORK OF ALL KINDS, THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ON MEDICAL AND ALLIED SCIENTIFIC SUBJECTS, THE FOUNDING, MAINLAINING OR INCREASING OF MEDICAL AND ALLIED SCHOLARSHIPS, CLASSES, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, UNIVERSITIES AND LECTURESHIPS, THE PROVISION GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE, AS MAY BE THOUGHT PROPER, OF AMBULANCES AND HOSPITAL, NURSING HOME, CONVALESCENT HOME AND CLINIC ACCOMMODATION AND TREATMENT FOR PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND OF MEDICINES, DRUGS, MEDICAL AND SURGICAL PREPARATIONS, APPLIANCES AND APPARATUS, RESTORATIVES AND SUSTENANCE FOR ANY SUCH PERSONS DURING SICKNESS, ILLNESS OR CONVALESCENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 DEVONSHIRE PLACE
LONDON
W1G 6BW
- Phone:
- 02079354444
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window